THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:47:57 PM
Fitzgerald, John Peter
CPSO#:
96635
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Department of Supportive Care, Princess Margaret Hospital, 610 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 2M9
Date Received: 24 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 03 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2015 |