THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:04:51 PM
Elmekkawi, Amir Elsayed
CPSO#:
96626
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Elmekkawi Mohamed, Amir Elsayed Abdou (used until: 02 May 2016 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Mansoura University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 665-9001
Fax: (905) 665-9335
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Dec 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2011 to 01 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Apr 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Apr 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2021 |
|
Active |