THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 10:21:42 AM
Tsai, Judy Peih-Ying
CPSO#:
96625
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Mandarin
Education: Northwestern University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Judy Peih-Ying Tsai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill, ON L4C 4Z3
Date Received: 23 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
EL - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2018 |