THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 11:46:23 AM
Maynes, Jason Thomas
CPSO#:
96608
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
and Pain Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5934
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Missouri
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:19 Jul 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Apr 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2019 |
|
Active |