THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:28:06 PM
Belostotsky, Vladimir
CPSO#:
96600
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Paediatric Nephrology Unit, Ward 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75635
Fax: (905) 308-7548
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:19 Jul 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:19 Jul 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2024 |
|
Active |