THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 16:37:35 PM
Alatishe, Yuri Adetokunboh
CPSO#:
96590
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 5th Street West PO Box 585
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 388-2511
Fax: (905) 575-6038
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YURI ADETOKUNBOH ALATISHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALATISHE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 18 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Jul 2012
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2012 |