THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:06:08 PM
Fathi, Kate A
CPSO#:
96586
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Eastern Ontario
CHEO
401 Smyth Rd
Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATE A FATHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2013 to 20 Sep 2013
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |