THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:09:08 AM
Ahmad, Fuad
CPSO#:
96577
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Pashto, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Woodbridge Med Walk-In Clinic
9200 Weston Rd
Unit 24
Woodbridge ON L4H 2P8
Phone: 905-553-0393
Fax: 905-266-1056
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FUAD AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2012 |