THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:39:10 AM
Nair, Saeda Sabarinath
CPSO#:
96575
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Kerala, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
Hsc 2V14
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 May 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Aug 2014
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 30 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2023 |
|
Active |