THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:51:00 AM
Singh, Amandeep
CPSO#:
96574
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON L6R 3Y5
Phone: (905) 792-0074
Fax: (905) 792-0078
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Nov 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2012 |
|
Active |