THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:07:48 PM
Parveen, Kazi Shahnaz
CPSO#:
96553
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
02 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Chittagong, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2015
Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Apr 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kazi Shahnaz Parveen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 16, 2016:
Dr. Parveen was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family practice. As a result of the investigation:
• Dr. Parveen shall see patients no more than six (6) hours per day, and shall see no more than thirty (30) patients within the 6 hour work day.
• Dr. Parveen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.
• Dr. Parveen will engage in professional education.
• Dr. Parveen’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.