THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:03:08 PM
Potoczny, Stefan
CPSO#:
96551
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Grey Bruce Health Services |
Owen Sound |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site |
Durham |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
West Haldimand,General Hospital |
Hagersville |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEFAN POTOCZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTOCZNY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Apr 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2011 |