THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:22:46 PM
Somasundaram, Nilany
CPSO#:
96546
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Nottingham, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
King City Medical Associate
20 Doctors Lane, BOX 370
King City ON L7B 1A6
Phone: 9058335381
Fax: 9058335649
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Nilany Somasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NILANY SOMASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 10 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2013 |