THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:56:49 PM
Manickavasagam, Uma Shankar
CPSO#:
96519
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Huron Perth Health Care Alliance
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:27 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. UMA SHANKAR MANICKAVASAGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANICKAVASAGAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2016 |