THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:38:04 PM
Odejayi, Gbolahan Olatokunbo Bamidele
CPSO#:
96496
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON L9C 0E3
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 39055
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GBOLAHAN OLATOKUNBO BAMIDELE ODEJAYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODEJAYI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |