THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:24:48 AM
Rosa Pereira dos Santos, Joana
CPSO#:
96477
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Urology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Ext. 205352
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:14 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOANA ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2020 |