THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:26:46 PM
Rochowski, Andrzej
CPSO#:
96474
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1637 Woodroffe Ave
Unit 102
Nepean ON K2G 1W2
Phone: 613-274-0131
Fax: 613-274-0355
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Andrzej Rochowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 11 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Aug 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jun 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jun 2016 |
|
Active |