THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:35:55 PM
Rossi Ricci, Alessandra
CPSO#:
96447
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: University of Pavia, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALESSANDRA ROSSI RICCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSI RICCI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 24 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 24 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 12 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2018 |