THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:44:23 AM
Alshammari, Nuha Salem
CPSO#:
96422
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Faisal University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jul 2011
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 23 Nov 2013
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2016 |