THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:21:36 AM
Serrano Aybar, Pablo Emilio
CPSO#:
96399
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Costa Rica, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer
Centre
B3 - 161
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43872
Fax: (905) 540-6519
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
|
Active |