THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:57:42 AM
Kalaniti, Kaarthigeyan
CPSO#:
96389
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sri Ramachandra Med Col\Research Instit, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 22 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |