THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:20:26 AM
Surak, Aimann
CPSO#:
96380
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tichreen, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10240 Kingsway NW
Edmonton AB T5H 3V9
Phone: 780-735-6870
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2011 to 12 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
AVP - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |