THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:27:04 PM
Mottaghian, Mozhdeh
CPSO#:
96375
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON L9R 1W7
Phone: 7054356281
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mozhdeh Mottaghian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOZHDEH MOTTAGHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTTAGHIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2023 to 09 Apr 2023
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2013 |