THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:29:35 PM
Janjua, Meer Mahmood Muneer
CPSO#:
96353
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1254 Bloor St W
Ultra Bloor Walk In Clinic
Toronto ON M6H 1N5
Phone: 647-427-3574
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Meer Janjua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Sep 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEER MAHMOOD MUNEER JANJUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANJUA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
EL - Forensic Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2016 |