THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:05:49 AM
Weerdenburg, Kirstin Darcie
CPSO#:
96352
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kid-E-Care Pediatric Walk-In Clinic
Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017
Instructions/Address:
The Hospita For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017
Instructions/Address:McMaster Childrens Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8W 3Z5
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |