THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:53:33 AM
Abu Shama, Raed Abdel Rahim Hassan
CPSO#:
96304
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tichreen, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7258
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Apr 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:27 Apr 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 2018 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Apr 2018 |
|
Active |