THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:21:32 PM
Gomez Hernandez, Karen Ester
CPSO#:
96285
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Costa Rica, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Endocrinology
Fourth floor, Suite 413
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 4165864437
Fax: 4165868861
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Costa Rica
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:30 Nov 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2024 |
|
Active |