THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:12:37 AM
Hossain, Nasreen
CPSO#:
96271
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Rajshahi Medical College, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dorchester Medical Center
2- 4327 Hamilton Road
Dorchester ON N0L 1G3
Phone: (519) 202-7391 Ext. 1
Fax: (519) 202-7394
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NASREEN HOSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSSAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2013 |