THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:13:29 AM
Gill, Roopan Kaur
CPSO#:
96267
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Perioperative Services, Gynecology
5457
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 16043690774
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Roopan Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 25 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:21 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROOPAN KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |