THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 11:11:28 AM
Harvey, Shauna Marie
CPSO#:
96266
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 08 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |