THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:50:04 AM
Samosh, Adam Isaac
CPSO#:
96262
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
350 Victoria St
Toronto ON M5B 2K3
Phone: 416-979-5070
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Martin Samosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2014
Corporation Name: Adam Samosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Westmount Family Physicians
Westmount Shopping Centre
Suite 254
185 Wonderland Road South
London ON N6K 1M6
Date Received: 18 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADAM ISAAC SAMOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMOSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2019 |