THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:00:13 PM
Panu, Anukul
CPSO#:
96235
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
11010 101 ST NW
Edmonton AB T5H 4B9
Phone: 780-426-1121
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANUKUL PANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2013 |