THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:50:46 AM
Falardeau, Brandi Lynn
CPSO#:
96233
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Community Health Centre
263 Weller Avenue #4
Kingston ON K7K 2V4
Phone: (613) 542 2949
Fax: (613) 542-7657
Electoral District: 06
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:My new practice location is: Kingston Community Health Centre. 263 Weller Avenue, Kingston, Ontario, K7K 2V4 Fax: 613-542-7657.
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Mar 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRANDI LYNN FALARDEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALARDEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2015 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2015 |