THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:21:36 PM
Guindon, Melissa Marie Louise
CPSO#:
96227
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1811 boul st Joseph
Orléans ON K1C 7C6
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: (613) 590-7351
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Melissa Guindon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2021
Corporation Name: melissa guindon medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 22 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELISSA MARIE LOUISE GUINDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUINDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2013 |