THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:11:57 AM
Abedi, Syed Morteza
CPSO#:
96214
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Sint Eustatius, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 905 683 2320 Ext. 15030
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:03 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYED MORTEZA ABEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2017 |