THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:05:15 PM
Carlson, Pamela Sue
CPSO#:
96210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dalby Family Practice
PO Box 3000
21 Hamilton Street
Elora ON N0B 1S0
Phone: 226-369-0264
Fax: 226-369-0246
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jul 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAMELA SUE CARLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2011
EL - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 18 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2013 |