THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:42:23 PM
Sakran, Mahmoud Hassan Mohamed Ali
CPSO#:
96184
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Sana'a, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 May 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 May 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 May 2020 |
|
Active |