THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:41:11 AM
Khanna, Robin
CPSO#:
96144
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBIN KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2016 |