THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:42:36 PM
Wang, Xu
CPSO#:
96134
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Peking Union Medical University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-804-9300
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:18 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. XU WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
AVP - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 25 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 28 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2015 |