THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:52:09 PM
Thomson, Margaret Evelyn
CPSO#:
96129
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Elisabeth Bruyère Hospital
43 Bruyère Street
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Phone: 613-562-6262 Ext. 4010
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARGARET EVELYN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 10 Apr 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2012 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2014 |