THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:53:18 AM
O'Connor, Christine Premila
CPSO#:
96128
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Feb 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 800
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON L9B2W2
Phone: 905-575-5200
Fax: 905-575-5383
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jan 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE PREMILA O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 09 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 09 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 10 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2018 |