Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 1, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 16, 2018, Windsor Regional Hospital (WRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective August 3, 2018, Dr. Ashim Verma voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at WRH and, further, that effective November 1, 2018, Dr. Verma’s privileges at WRH were revoked.
Source: Hospital
Active Date: August 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 7, 2018, Windsor Regional Hospital (WRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective August 3, 2018, Dr. Ashim Verma voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at WRH until August 20, 2018, during the course of an investigation by WRH.