THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:23:32 AM
Ashkanase, Jenna Lee
CPSO#:
96101
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Nov 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNA LEE ASHKANASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHKANASE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2020 |