THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:19:21 AM
So, Anthony Chi Long
CPSO#:
96092
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:5292 Yonge St
North York, Ontario
M2N 5P9
Date Received: 07 Jul 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:06 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 2020 |