THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:56:27 AM
Garbens, Alaina
CPSO#:
96088
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Apr 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Suite 212
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Phone: 416-777-0404
Fax: 6477776117
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAINA GARBENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBENS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2021 |