THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:28:44 AM
Nuttall, James Paul Rekai
CPSO#:
96054
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:29 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |