THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:21:23 AM
Gunaratnam, Senthuran
CPSO#:
96051
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Jaffna, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network,
Centenary Site
Department of Psychiatry
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 5330
Fax: (416) 281-7320
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SENTHURAN GUNARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNARATNAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
AVP - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 May 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2020 |