THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:26:04 AM
Alheraish, Yasser Abdulrhman I
CPSO#:
96041
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care
McMaster University, 10 Aug 2011 to 09 Aug 2012
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
McMaster University, 10 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |