THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/03/24 21:13:59 PM
Chhabra, Mehtaab Kaur
CPSO#:
96005
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Uppal, Mehtaab Kaur (used until: 22 Jun 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.K. Chhabra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 30 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
AVP - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2019 |