THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:31:43 AM
Hakim, Shaheed Waliul
CPSO#:
96001
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHEED WALIUL HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |